Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roger William Bede Vaughan, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sydney, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1834Born
9 Apr 185925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Feb 187339.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sydney, Australia
28 Feb 187339.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
19 Mar 187339.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
16 Mar 187743.1SucceededArchbishop of Sydney, Australia
17 Aug 188349.6DiedArchbishop of Sydney, Australia

MicroData Summary for Roger William Bede Vaughan (VIAF: 288203993)
Archbishop Roger William Bede Vaughan O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Sydney

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCourtfield, Great Britain
Ordained PriestSt. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Vincent de Paul, Liverpool, Diocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 24.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 404, and Page 530
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017