Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Dunne

Deceased

Archbishop of Brisbane, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1830Born
4 Jun 185423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
3 Jan 188251.3AppointedBishop of Brisbane, Australia
18 Jun 188251.7Ordained BishopBishop of Brisbane, Australia
13 May 188756.6AppointedArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia
13 Jan 191786.3DiedArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for Robert Dunne (VIAF: 69734132)
Archbishop Robert Dunne (born , died ) Archbishop of Brisbane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLismore, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Etienne, Cathedral, Brisbane, Diocese of Brisbane

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017