Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Cani

Deceased

Bishop of Rockhampton, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1836Born
1857²20.0Ordained PriestPriest
187740.0AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Queensland, Australia
3 Jan 188245.0AppointedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
21 May 188245.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
11 Jun 188245.4InstalledBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
3 Mar 189861.1DiedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Cani
Bishop John Cani (born , died ) Bishop of Rockhampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel Bolognese, Diocese of Imola, Italy
Ordained BishopSainte Marie, Cathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1882, Page 217
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 484
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018