Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse-Hilarion Fraysse, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1842Born
1864¹21.5ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
6 Aug 186523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
6 Apr 188037.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
6 Apr 188037.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
25 Jul 188038.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
1 May 190562.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alphonse-Hilarion Fraysse
Bishop Alphonse-Hilarion Fraysse S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Salvetat-Peyralès, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney, Australia

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017