Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elzear (Aloysius) Torreggiani, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Armidale, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1830Born
23 May 185322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Feb 187948.6AppointedBishop of Armidale, Australia
25 Mar 187948.8Ordained BishopBishop of Armidale, Australia
28 Jan 190473.6DiedBishop of Armidale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Elzear (Aloysius) Torreggiani
Bishop Elzear (Aloysius) Torreggiani O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Armidale

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto di Recanati, Italy
Ordained BishopPeckham

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 124
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017