Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Weathers

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Amyclae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1814Born
1838²23.1Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
27 Sep 187257.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
27 Sep 187257.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
28 Oct 187257.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
4 Mar 189580.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Weathers
Bishop William Weathers (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Middlesex, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Salford, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Death PlacePoor Sisters of Nazareth, Convent, Isleworth, Middlesex, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 97
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 103
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018