Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Brown, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Newport and Menevia, Wales


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1798BornBath
28 Oct 181416.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Mar 182324.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Apr 182324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Jun 184042.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
3 Jul 184042.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Wales District, Wales, Great Britain
28 Oct 184042.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
29 Sep 185052.4AppointedBishop of Newport and Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
29 Sep 185052.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 185153.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
12 Apr 188081.9DiedBishop of Newport and Menevia, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Brown (VIAF: 65975780)
Bishop Thomas Joseph Brown O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Newport and Menevia

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 408, and Page 493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 81
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 47
  • b/od: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016