Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Henry Davis, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Maitland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1815BornUsk, Monmouth, Great Britain
8 Nov 184025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Sep 184631.3AppointedBishop of Maitland, Australia
25 Feb 184832.8Ordained BishopBishop of Maitland, Australia
17 May 185439.0DiedBishop of Maitland, Australia

MicroData Summary for Charles Henry Davis:
Bishop Charles Henry Davis O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Maitland

  • a priest for 13.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 360
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013