Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Samuel John Augustine Sheehy, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1827Born
11 Jul 184820.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Mar 185224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Nov 186639.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
23 Nov 186639.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
28 Mar 186840.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Sydney, Australia
28 Mar 186840.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Bethsaida
14 Sep 191082.9DiedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict

MicroData Summary for Samuel John Augustine Sheehy (VIAF: 91332604)
Father Samuel John Augustine Sheehy O.S.B. (born , died ) Priest of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCork, Diocese of Cork, Ireland
Death PlaceRandwick, Archdiocese of Sydney, Australia

  • a priest for 58.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 148
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017