Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Mary Redwood, S.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Wellington, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1839Born
6 Jun 186526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
10 Feb 187435.0AppointedBishop of Wellington, New Zealand
17 Mar 187435.1Ordained BishopBishop of Wellington, New Zealand
13 May 188748.3AppointedArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
3 Jan 193595.9DiedArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Francis Mary Redwood (VIAF: 93058401)
Archbishop Francis Mary Redwood S.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Wellington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTixall, Diocese of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopSpitalfields-Ste Anne, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 69.5 years
  • a bishop for 60.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 597
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017