Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Hubert Blenk, S.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1856Born
16 Aug 188529.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
12 Jun 189942.8AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
2 Jul 189942.9Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
20 Apr 190649.7AppointedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
1 Jul 190649.9InstalledArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
20 Apr 191760.7DiedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for James Hubert Blenk
Archbishop James Hubert Blenk S.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeustadt, Diocese of Speyer, Germany
Ordained BishopSt. Louis, Cathedral, New Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana
Death PlaceNew Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 464
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017