Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John William Shaw

Deceased

Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1863BornMobile
26 May 188824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mobile, Alabama, USA
7 Feb 191046.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
7 Feb 191046.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Castabala
14 Apr 191046.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castabala
11 Mar 191147.2SucceededBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
25 Jan 191854.1AppointedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
2 Nov 193470.8DiedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for John William Shaw:
Archbishop John William Shaw (born , died ) Archbishop of New Orleans

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 60
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 18
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015