Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Emmet Tracy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA


Graphics images used by permission of Diocese of Baton Rouge

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1909Born
12 Jun 193222.7Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
13 Mar 195949.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
13 Mar 195949.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sergentza
19 May 195949.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sergentza
10 Aug 196151.9AppointedBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA
21 Mar 197464.5ResignedBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA
4 Apr 198070.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Emmet Tracy
Bishop Robert Emmet Tracy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Baton Rouge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Orleans

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017