Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Schexnayder

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1895BornWallace, LA
11 Apr 192529.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 195055.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
11 Dec 195055.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tuscamia
22 Feb 195155.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tuscamia
13 Mar 195660.6AppointedBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
7 Nov 197277.2RetiredBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
23 Jan 198185.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Maurice Schexnayder:
Bishop Maurice Schexnayder (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013