Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Douglas Deshotel

Bishop of Lafayette, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1952 BornBasile, LA
13 May 197826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
11 Mar 201058.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
11 Mar 201058.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cova
27 Apr 201058.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cova
17 Feb 201664.1AppointedBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
15 Apr 201664.2InstalledBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for John Douglas Deshotel
Bishop John Douglas Deshotel (born ) Bishop of Lafayette

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lafayette.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,635
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2016
  • i: CB, 19 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 7 Apr 2016