Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Dallas

Dioecesis Dallasensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Kevin Joseph Farrell, Bishop
  • John Douglas Deshotel, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Charles Victor Grahmann, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 9 August 1969
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of San Antonio
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Texas
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 19,475 (7,523 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the following nine Counties in the State of Texas: Collin, Dallas, Ellis, Fannin, Grayson, Hunt, Kaufman, Navarro and Rockwall.
  • Conference Region: X (AR, OK, TX)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: DAL
  • Official Web Site: http://www.cathdal.org/
  • Mailing Address: 3725 Blackburn St., P.O. Box 190507, Dallas, TX 75219
  • Telephone: (214)528-2240
  • Fax: 528-0287

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Dallas
15 July 1890ErectedDiocese of Galveston Diocese of Dallas (erected)
1891Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Arizona (El Paso County in Texas) Diocese of Dallas
1892Territory AddedDiocese of Dallas (Counties of El Paso, Hudspeth, and Culberson)
3 March 1914Territory LostDiocese of Dallas
Diocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Tucson
Diocese of El Paso (erected)
3 August 1926Territory LostDiocese of Dallas
Diocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Amarillo (erected)
15 November 1947Territory LostDiocese of Dallas
Diocese of Galveston
Archdiocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Austin (erected)
Diocese of Dallas-Fort Worth
20 October 1953Name ChangedDiocese of Dallas Diocese of Dallas-Fort Worth
16 October 1961Territory LostDiocese of Amarillo
Diocese of Austin
Diocese of Dallas-Fort Worth
Diocese of El Paso
Diocese of San Angelo (erected)
Diocese of Dallas
9 August 1969SplitDiocese of Dallas-Fort Worth Diocese of Dallas
Diocese of Fort Worth
12 December 1986Territory LostDiocese of Beaumont
Diocese of Dallas
Diocese of Galveston-Houston
Diocese of Tyler (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Dallas
195067,0692,800,0002.4%817415543237555139ap1951
Diocese of Dallas-Fort Worth
1966157,5003,150,0005.0%14515630152394ap1967
Diocese of Dallas
1970108,9862,139,9005.1%8410619057312148153ap1971
1976123,4532,487,1005.0%931152085932612737656ap1977
1980165,4832,778,6566.0%9410419883510010435561ap1981
1990212,2642,532,6278.4%104741781,192937420163ap1991
1999555,1722,971,69918.7%100841843,017139615865ap2000
2000605,4572,990,70320.2%121771983,0571379716672ap2001
2001630,1562,979,84021.1%125721973,1981548115365ap2002
2002843,1673,200,06426.3%125752004,2151529915570ap2003
2003854,1813,247,83726.3%97741714,9951628314667ap2004
2004930,3523,371,30027.6%122761984,6981459614667ap2005
2006955,2983,473,56827.5%122751974,8491529812767ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013