Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
25 June 1966 | Erected | Diocese of Galveston-Houston (Counties of : Angelina Cherokee, Hardin, Jasper, Jefferson, Nacogdokes, Newton, Orange, Polk, Sabine, San Augustine, Shelby, Tyler, and parts of Chambers and Liberty, and the bays of Trinity Bay and Galveston Bay) | Diocese of Beaumont (erected) |
12 December 1986 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Beaumont (Angelina, Cherokee, Nacogdoches, Sabine, San Augustine, and Shelby)
Diocese of Dallas (Bowie, Camp, Gass, Delta, Franklin, Gregg, Harrison, Henderson, Hopkins. Iamar, Marion, Morris, Panola, Rains, Red River, Rusk, Smith, Titus, Upshur, Van Zandt, and Wood) Diocese of Galveston-Houston (Anderson, Freestone, Houston, Leon, and Trinity) | Diocese of Tyler (erected) |
29 December 2004 | Metropolitan Changed | Diocese of Beaumont (from San Antonio) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1966 | 83,605 | 568,992 | 14.7% | 42 | 28 | 70 | 1,194 | 32 | ap1967 | |||
1970 | 91,200 | 571,523 | 16.0% | 46 | 38 | 84 | 1,085 | 41 | 173 | 34 | ap1971 | |
1976 | 77,347 | 586,598 | 13.2% | 53 | 30 | 83 | 931 | 37 | 117 | 41 | ap1977 | |
1980 | 83,973 | 601,000 | 14.0% | 47 | 34 | 81 | 1,036 | 6 | 36 | 121 | 44 | ap1981 |
1990 | 86,919 | 538,400 | 16.1% | 49 | 22 | 71 | 1,224 | 15 | 23 | 63 | 52 | ap1991 |
1999 | 87,604 | 577,664 | 15.2% | 50 | 22 | 72 | 1,216 | 31 | 3 | 53 | 44 | ap2000 |
2000 | 88,625 | 582,625 | 15.2% | 48 | 26 | 74 | 1,197 | 30 | 29 | 50 | 44 | ap2001 |
2001 | 95,397 | 588,265 | 16.2% | 44 | 28 | 72 | 1,324 | 30 | 31 | 39 | 44 | ap2002 |
2002 | 94,037 | 588,265 | 16.0% | 45 | 28 | 73 | 1,288 | 30 | 29 | 45 | 44 | ap2003 |
2003 | 94,780 | 596,992 | 15.9% | 44 | 25 | 69 | 1,373 | 30 | 26 | 46 | 44 | ap2004 |
2004 | 89,345 | 599,139 | 14.9% | 48 | 18 | 66 | 1,353 | 32 | 19 | 38 | 45 | ap2005 |
2006 | 80,194 | 603,648 | 13.3% | 47 | 22 | 69 | 1,162 | 32 | 24 | 28 | 45 | ap2007 |
2012 | 79,516 | 630,000 | 12.6% | 44 | 23 | 67 | 1,186 | 32 | 23 | 22 | 44 | ap2013 |
2015 | 74,100 | 633,000 | 11.7% | 42 | 26 | 68 | 1,089 | 38 | 27 | 16 | 44 | ap2016 |
2018 | 73,348 | 636,455 | 11.5% | 40 | 22 | 62 | 1,183 | 45 | 24 | 16 | 44 | ap2019 |
2020 | 79,624 | 645,902 | 12.3% | 42 | 26 | 68 | 1,170 | 44 | 27 | 20 | 42 | ap2021 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 8 Aug 2023 |
✠