Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Madeley Harris

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Austin, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1913BornConroe
19 Mar 193824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Galveston, Texas, USA
4 Jul 196652.7AppointedBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
28 Sep 196652.9Ordained BishopBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
29 Sep 196652.9InstalledBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
27 Apr 197157.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Austin, Texas, USA
27 Apr 197157.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotaria
15 Nov 197158.0SucceededBishop of Austin, Texas, USA
25 Feb 198571.3ResignedBishop of Austin, Texas, USA
31 Mar 198874.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Austin, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Vincent Madeley Harris:
Bishop Vincent Madeley Harris (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Austin

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 27 Feb 2015