Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard James Ganter

Deceased

Bishop of Beaumont, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1928BornGalveston
22 May 195223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Galveston, Texas, USA
13 Dec 197244.4AppointedBishop of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
7 Feb 197344.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
18 Oct 197749.3AppointedBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
13 Dec 197749.4InstalledBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
9 Oct 199365.2DiedBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard James Ganter:
Bishop Bernard James Ganter (born , died ) Bishop of Beaumont

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013