Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis La Ravoire Morrow, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Krishnagar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1892BornWeatherford, TX, USA
21 May 192128.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 May 193946.4AppointedBishop of Krishnagar, India
29 Oct 193946.8Ordained BishopBishop of Krishnagar, India
31 Oct 196976.9RetiredBishop of Krishnagar, India
31 Oct 196976.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Valliposita
27 Apr 197178.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Valliposita
31 Aug 198794.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Krishnagar, India

MicroData Summary for Louis La Ravoire Morrow:
Bishop Louis La Ravoire Morrow S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Krishnagar

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 47.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013