Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrique Sánchez y Paredes

Deceased

Archbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1876Born
28 Oct 190630.2Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
24 Jan 191942.5AppointedArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
8 Jun 191942.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
25 Mar 192346.6DiedArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México

MicroData Summary for Enrique Sánchez y Paredes
Archbishop Enrique Sánchez y Paredes (born , died ) Archbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmozoc

  • a priest for 16.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018