Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Patrick Lynch

Deceased

Bishop of Dallas-Fort Worth, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1872Born
9 Jun 190027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
8 Jun 191138.5AppointedBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
12 Jul 191138.6Ordained BishopBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
19 Aug 195481.7DiedBishop of Dallas-Fort Worth, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Patrick Lynch
Bishop Joseph Patrick Lynch (born , died ) Bishop of Dallas-Fort Worth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Joseph, MI, Diocese of Detroit, Michigan
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Dallas, Diocese of Dallas, Texas

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 58
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017