Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Morris

Deceased

Bishop of Little Rock, Arkansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1866BornHendersonville, TN
11 Jun 189226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
16 Apr 190639.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
16 Apr 190639.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Acmonia
11 Jun 190640.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acmonia
21 Feb 190740.6SucceededBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
22 Oct 194680.3DiedBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Morris:
Bishop John Baptist Morris (born , died ) Bishop of Little Rock

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 35
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013