Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Preston Joseph Graves

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alexandria-Shreveport, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1916BornTexarkana
11 Jun 194226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
24 Feb 196952.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
24 Feb 196952.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vina
25 Apr 196952.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vina
10 May 197357.0AppointedBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
20 Jul 198266.2ResignedBishop of Alexandria-Shreveport, Louisiana, USA
15 Jan 199477.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Alexandria-Shreveport, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Preston Joseph Graves:
Bishop Lawrence Preston Joseph Graves (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alexandria-Shreveport

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 4 Apr 2015