Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Benedict Friend

Bishop Emeritus of Shreveport, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1931 BornMiami, FL
7 May 195927.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mobile-Birmingham, Alabama, USA
31 Aug 197947.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alexandria-Shreveport, Louisiana, USA
31 Aug 197947.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pomaria
30 Oct 197948.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pomaria
17 Nov 198251.0AppointedBishop of Alexandria-Shreveport, Louisiana, USA
11 Jan 198351.2InstalledBishop of Alexandria-Shreveport, Louisiana, USA
16 Jun 198654.6AppointedBishop of Shreveport, Louisiana, USA
30 Jul 198654.7InstalledBishop of Shreveport, Louisiana, USA
20 Dec 200675.1RetiredBishop of Shreveport, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for William Benedict Friend:
Bishop William Benedict Friend (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Shreveport

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shreveport.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015