Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Oscar Hugh Lipscomb

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mobile, Alabama, USA


Motto: Caritate Non Ficta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1931Born
15 Jul 195624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mobile-Birmingham, Alabama, USA
29 Jul 198048.8AppointedArchbishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
16 Nov 198049.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
2 Apr 200876.5RetiredArchbishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
15 Jul 202088.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mobile, Alabama, USA

MicroData Summary
Oscar Hugh Lipscomb
Archbishop Oscar Hugh Lipscomb
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Mobile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMobile, Diocese of Mobile, Alabama
Ordained PriestTwelve Holy Apostles, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopMunicipal Auditorium, Mobile, Archdiocese of Mobile, Alabama
Death PlaceLittle Sisters of the Poor residence, Mobile, Archdiocese of Mobile, Alabama
Buried Place (Original)Immaculate Conceptiom, Cathedral Basilica, Mobile, Archdiocese of Mobile, Alabama

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,917
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 18 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025