Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Raymond Gaydos

Bishop Emeritus of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1943 Born
20 Dec 196825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
25 Jun 199753.8AppointedBishop of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA
27 Aug 199754.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA
21 Nov 201774.2ResignedBishop of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for John Raymond Gaydos
Bishop John Raymond Gaydos (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Jefferson City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Jefferson City, Diocese of Jefferson City, Missouri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jefferson City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 330
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,038
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast