Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Francis McAuliffe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jefferson City, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1920BornKansas City
31 May 194524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
2 Jul 196948.6AppointedBishop of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA
18 Aug 196948.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA
25 Jun 199776.5RetiredBishop of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA
9 Jan 200685.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Francis McAuliffe:
Bishop Michael Francis McAuliffe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jefferson City

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015