Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Herman Helmsing

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1908BornShrewsbury
10 Jun 193325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
17 Mar 194940.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
17 Mar 194940.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Axomis
19 Apr 194941.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Axomis
24 Aug 195648.4AppointedBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
27 Jan 196253.8AppointedBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
27 Jun 197769.2ResignedBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
20 Dec 199385.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Herman Helmsing:
Bishop Charles Herman Helmsing (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kansas City-Saint Joseph

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015