Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignatius Jerome Strecker

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kansas City in Kansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1917BornSpearville, KS
19 Dec 194225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wichita, Kansas, USA
7 Apr 196244.4AppointedBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
20 Jun 196244.6Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
28 Jun 196244.6InstalledBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
4 Sep 196951.8AppointedArchbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
28 Oct 196951.9InstalledArchbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
28 Jun 199375.6RetiredArchbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
16 Oct 200385.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kansas City in Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Jerome Strecker:
Archbishop Ignatius Jerome Strecker (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kansas City in Kansas

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 83
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013