Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herbert Hermes, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1933Born
11 Jul 195421.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
26 May 196027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Jun 199057.0AppointedPrelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
2 Sep 199057.2Ordained BishopPrelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
25 Feb 200975.7RetiredPrelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
3 Jan 201884.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Herbert Hermes
Bishop Herbert Hermes O.S.B. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Cristalândia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShallow Water, KS, Diocese of Wichita, Kansas, USA
Ordained BishopSt. Benedict's, Abbey, Atchison, Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
Death PlaceGeneral Hospital, Palmas, Tocantins

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2018