Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick William Freking

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Crosse, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1913BornHuron Lake, MN
31 Jul 193824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Winona, Minnesota, USA
10 Oct 195744.1AppointedBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
30 Nov 195744.3Ordained BishopBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
7 Jan 195844.4InstalledBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
30 Dec 196451.3AppointedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
24 Feb 196551.5InstalledBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
10 May 198369.7ResignedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
28 Nov 199885.2DiedBishop Emeritus of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Frederick William Freking:
Bishop Frederick William Freking (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Crosse

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015