Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Firmin Martin Schmidt, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mendi, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1918Born
2 Jun 194627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Apr 195940.4AppointedPrefect of Mendi, Papua New Guinea
6 Jul 196546.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mendi, Papua New Guinea
6 Jul 196546.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Conana
15 Dec 196547.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Conana
15 Nov 196648.0AppointedBishop of Mendi, Papua New Guinea
3 Feb 199576.3RetiredBishop of Mendi, Papua New Guinea
4 Aug 200586.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Mendi, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Firmin Martin Schmidt
Bishop Firmin Martin Schmidt O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mendi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatharine, KS, Diocese of Salina, Kansas, USA
Ordained PriestVictoria, KS, Diocese of Salina, Kansas, USA

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast