Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Augustine Thill

Deceased

Bishop of Salina, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1893Born
28 Feb 192026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
24 Aug 193844.8AppointedBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA
28 Oct 193845.0Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA
15 Nov 193845.0InstalledBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA
21 May 195763.6DiedBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Augustine Thill
Bishop Francis Augustine Thill (born , died ) Bishop of Salina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDayton, OH
Ordained BishopSt. Monica, Cathedral, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio
Buried Place (Original)Mt. Calvary, Cemetery, Salina, Diocese of Salina, Kansas

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1938, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast