Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Urban John Vehr

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Denver, Colorado, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1891Born
29 May 191523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
17 Apr 193139.8AppointedBishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
10 Jun 193140.0Ordained BishopBishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
15 Nov 194150.4AppointedArchbishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
18 Feb 196775.7RetiredArchbishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
18 Feb 196775.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Masuccaba
31 Dec 197079.5ResignedTitular Archbishop of Masuccaba
19 Sep 197382.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Denver, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for Urban John Vehr
Archbishop Urban John Vehr (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Denver

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCincinnati

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1931, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018