Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Otterwell Brady

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1899BornFall River
21 Dec 192324.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 193940.4AppointedBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
24 Aug 193940.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
16 Jun 195657.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
16 Jun 195657.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
11 Oct 195657.7SucceededArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
1 Oct 196162.7DiedArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for William Otterwell Brady:
Archbishop William Otterwell Brady (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint Paul

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1939, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013