Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Edwin Cassidy

Deceased

Bishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1869Born
8 Sep 189829.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 193060.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
21 Mar 193060.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ibora
27 May 193060.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ibora
3 Oct 193061.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
13 Jul 193464.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
28 Jul 193464.9SucceededBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA
17 May 195181.7DiedBishop of Fall River, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for James Edwin Cassidy
Bishop James Edwin Cassidy (born , died ) Bishop of Fall River

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWoonsocket, RI

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,930, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast