Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Patrick Keough

Deceased

Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1889Born
10 Jun 191626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
10 Feb 193444.1AppointedBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
22 May 193444.3Ordained BishopBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
29 Nov 194757.9AppointedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
24 Feb 194858.1InstalledArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
8 Dec 196171.9DiedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Patrick Keough
Archbishop Francis Patrick Keough (born , died ) Archbishop of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Britain

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,934, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast