Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Joseph Neylon, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caroline Islands, Federated States of Micronesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1920BornBuffalo, NY
18 Jun 195030.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Oct 196949.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
2 Oct 196949.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Libertina
2 Feb 197049.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Libertina
20 Sep 197151.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
3 May 197959.2AppointedBishop of Carolines-Marshalls, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
3 Feb 198059.9InstalledBishop of Carolines-Marshalls, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
23 Apr 199373.1AppointedBishop of Caroline Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
25 May 199575.2RetiredBishop of Caroline Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
13 Apr 200484.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Caroline Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Martin Joseph Neylon:
Bishop Martin Joseph Neylon S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caroline Islands

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015