Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Ignatius Kennally, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Caroline and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Sassura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1895Born
20 Jun 192833.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
4 Jul 194651.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Caroline and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
9 Dec 195661.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sassura
9 Dec 195661.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
25 Mar 195761.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sassura
20 Sep 197176.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
12 Apr 197781.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Caroline and Marshall Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Vincent Ignatius Kennally
Bishop Vincent Ignatius Kennally S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Caroline and Marshall Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDorchester, MA

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018