Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph McEleney, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston in Jamaica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1895BornWoburn, MA
18 Jun 193034.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Feb 195054.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Jamaica, Antilles
3 Feb 195054.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
15 Apr 195054.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
29 Feb 195660.3AppointedBishop of Kingston, Jamaica, Antilles
14 Sep 196771.8AppointedArchbishop of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
1 Sep 197074.8RetiredArchbishop of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
1 Sep 197074.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lorium
23 Dec 197075.1ResignedTitular Archbishop of Lorium
5 Oct 198690.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for John Joseph McEleney:
Archbishop John Joseph McEleney S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston in Jamaica

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013