Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Louis Hodapp, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belize


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1910Born
18 Jun 194130.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Mar 195847.4AppointedBishop of Belize
26 Jun 195847.7Ordained BishopBishop of Belize
11 Nov 198373.1ResignedBishop of Belize
26 Oct 198979.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Belize

MicroData Summary for Robert Louis Hodapp
Bishop Robert Louis Hodapp S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belize

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMankato, MN, USA

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast