Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Osmond Peter Martin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1930Born
3 Apr 195928.3Ordained PriestPriest of Belize, Belize
8 Jun 198251.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belize, Belize
8 Jun 198251.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
7 Oct 198251.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
11 Nov 198352.9AppointedBishop of Belize, Belize
18 Nov 200675.9RetiredBishop of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize, Antilles
16 Feb 201786.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Osmond Peter Martin
Bishop Osmond Peter Martin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belize City-Belmopan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDangriga
Death PlaceDangriga

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2006
  • d: CB, 16 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Feb 2017