Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dorick McGowan Wright

Bishop Emeritus of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1945 Born
27 Jun 197529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Belize, Belize
12 Dec 200156.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize, Antilles
12 Dec 200156.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thimida Regia
4 Apr 200256.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thimida Regia
18 Nov 200661.0AppointedBishop of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize, Antilles
26 Jan 201771.1ResignedBishop of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Dorick McGowan Wright
Bishop Dorick McGowan Wright (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Belize City-Belmopan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelize City

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Belize City-Belmopan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,160
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2017
  • ln: CB, 26 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Jan 2017