Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kingston in Jamaica

Archidioecesis Regiopolitanus in Iamaica



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Charles Henry Dufour, Archbishop
  • Edgerton Roland Clarke, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Donald James Reece, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1967
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Jamaica
  • Region: Antilles (West Indies)
  • Square Kilometers: 3,267 (1,261 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archdioceseofkingston.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's Residence, 21 Hopefield Avenue, P.O. Box 43, Kingston 6, Jamaica
  • Telephone: 927-9915; 978-6567
  • Fax: 927-4487

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica
10 January 1837ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Trinidad Vicariate Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica (erected)
10 June 1888Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica Prefecture Apostolic of British Honduras (erected)
Diocese of Kingston
29 February 1956ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica Diocese of Kingston
14 September 1967Territory LostDiocese of Kingston Diocese of Montego Bay (erected)
Archdiocese of Kingston in Jamaica
14 September 1967ElevatedDiocese of Kingston Archdiocese of Kingston in Jamaica
15 April 1991Territory LostArchdiocese of Kingston in Jamaica
Diocese of Montego Bay
Vicariate Apostolic of Mandeville (erected)
14 July 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Kingston in Jamaica Mission "Sui Iuris" of Cayman Islands (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica
194879,8981,340,0006.0%261631,26831176ap1951
Diocese of Kingston
1966139,5081,827,0007.6%17991161,2026626212ap1967
Archdiocese of Kingston in Jamaica
1970139,0841,176,92711.8%1575901,5459220827ap1971
1976152,4201,209,81912.6%20861061,43729918418ap1977
1978167,7141,153,04714.5%2264861,95027314829ap1981
199093,3981,379,8476.8%2650761,228136417034ap1991
199996,6451,360,0427.1%2434581,666178812933ap2000
200096,6451,360,0427.1%2329521,858184012733ap2001
200195,0001,407,0006.8%2329521,826167012332ap2002
200292,0001,407,0006.5%2229511,803219411533ap2003
200354,0001,407,0003.8%2528531,0182014211832ap2004
200456,0001,400,0004.0%2225471,1912013411632ap2005
200656,2001,405,0004.0%3027579851917411332ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 Jun 2013