Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Henry Dufour

Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles

Apostolic Administrator of Mandeville, Jamaica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1940 Born
12 Aug 197030.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 199555.6AppointedBishop of Montego Bay, Jamaica, Antilles
10 Feb 199655.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montego Bay, Jamaica, Antilles
15 Apr 201170.9AppointedArchbishop of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
29 Apr 201676.0RetiredArchbishop of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
29 Apr 201676.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Charles Henry Dufour
Archbishop Charles Henry Dufour (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston in Jamaica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKingston in Jamaica

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kingston in Jamaica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2011
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 476
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,685
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Apr 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast