Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Michael Boyle, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mandeville, Jamaica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1926BornDetroit, MI, USA
9 Jul 194620.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
30 May 195327.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
15 Apr 199164.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles
15 Apr 199164.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Canapium
9 Jul 199165.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canapium
21 Nov 199771.5AppointedBishop of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles
6 Jul 200478.1RetiredBishop of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles
10 Jan 200881.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Paul Michael Boyle:
Bishop Paul Michael Boyle C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mandeville

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,455
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013