Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edgerton Roland Clarke

Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston in Jamaica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1929 BornCambridge
2 Feb 196031.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kingston, Jamaica, Antilles
14 Sep 196738.6AppointedBishop of Montego Bay, Jamaica, Antilles
30 Nov 196738.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montego Bay, Jamaica, Antilles
11 Nov 199465.7AppointedArchbishop of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
17 Feb 200475.0RetiredArchbishop of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Edgerton Roland Clarke:
Archbishop Edgerton Roland Clarke (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston in Jamaica

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kingston in Jamaica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013