Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Malzaire

Bishop of Roseau, Dominica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1957 BornMons Repos
28 Jul 198527.8Ordained PriestPriest of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
10 Jul 200244.8AppointedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
4 Oct 200245.0Ordained BishopBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Malzaire:
Bishop Gabriel Malzaire (born ) Bishop of Roseau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roseau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013