Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Kelvin Edward Cardinal Felix

Archbishop Emeritus of Castries, Saint Lucia

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Salute a Primavalle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1933 BornRoseau
8 Apr 195623.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 198148.4AppointedArchbishop of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
5 Oct 198148.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
15 Feb 200875.0RetiredArchbishop of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
22 Feb 201481.0Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201481.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Salute a Primavalle
31 May 201481.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Salute a Primavalle

MicroData Summary for Kelvin Edward Felix:
Kelvin Edward Cardinal Felix (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Castries

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Castries.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2008
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 22 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 May 2014